+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
- Communicated to Governor
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1303ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment (62-Y 35-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 7-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103072D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 5, 2017: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
April 5, 2017: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
February 22, 2017: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
February 17, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 7-N)
February 14, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
January 24, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
January 19, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2017: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor