+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 52-N)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (45-Y 52-N)
- Pending question ordered
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 074471129-S3
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1301ER)
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (21-Y 18-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N)
- Passed House with substitute (80-Y 17-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1301H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 073504776-H1
- Read third time
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 073504776-H1
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 4-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, and Natural Resources (Cox)
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute rejected 070982776-S1
- Floor substitute printed 078670776-S2 (Newman)
- Substitute by Senator Newman agreed to 078670776-S2
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB1301S2
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 070982776-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 077448776
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: REJECTED (45-Y 52-N)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 2-N)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (21-Y 18-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 17-N)
February 19, 2007: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 4-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor