+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0561)
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 561 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB130ER)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Passed House (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: FOIA
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 088093244-E
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB130E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned GL&T sub: Subcommittee #1 (FOIA)
On January 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088093244
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N 1-A)
February 28, 2008: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2008: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor