+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1298ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #3
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 13103719D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1298E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 13103719D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2013: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Reported from Transportation with amendment (12-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor