+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0232)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 232 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1298ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102732D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2019: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2019: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 15, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 11, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 10, 2019: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor