+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0537)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 537 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1297ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101153D
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2011: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor