+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 372 (effective 8/1/15)
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/25/15
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1293ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 15101294D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1293E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101294D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor