+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Left in Transportation
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N)
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 Department of Motor Vehicles
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 23100569D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1293E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100569D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2023: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N)
February 1, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 16-N)
January 30, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2023: Reported from Transportation with amendments (9-Y 6-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor