+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (47-Y 51-N 1-A)
- Substitute by Delegate Ransone agreed to 15105401D-H1
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 15105401D-H1 (Ransone)
- Defeated by House (47-Y 51-N 1-A)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1292E
- Printed as engrossed 15101543D-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101543D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 24, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (47-Y 51-N 1-A)
February 18, 2015: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 8-N)
February 5, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor