+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0191)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 191 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB129ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N)
- Passed House with amendment (80-Y 19-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB129S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105960D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22105960D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100630D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2022: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2022: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N)
February 8, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 4, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2022: Rules suspended (0-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2022: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor