+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 13, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0972)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 5-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1287ER2)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (84-Y 5-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 972 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 29, 1999 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1287ER)
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
On February 22, 1999 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
- Passed House with amendment (90-Y 9-N)
On February 19, 1999 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 2-N)
On February 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
On February 12, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 997116755-S1
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 997116755-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 997116755-S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day in P. & E. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 997109755
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (84-Y 5-N)
April 7, 1999: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 9-N)
February 17, 1999: Reported from P. & E. w/amendment (22-Y 2-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 1-N)
February 9, 1999: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Passed by for the day in P. & E. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor