+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0925)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 925 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1286ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 070304824-S1
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1286ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 1-N)
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 070166824-E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1286E
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 070166824
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 1-N)
January 26, 2007: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2007: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor