+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1280S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105601D-S1
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105601D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101552D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2019: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
January 29, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
January 24, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor