+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (52)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0793)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 793 (effective 7/1/13)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1279ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 23-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (74-Y 23-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (31-Y 7-N)
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 5-N)
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1279ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (76-Y 21-N)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N)
- Conference substitute printed 13105385D-S2
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Delegates: Sherwood, Scott, E.T., Lewis
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Hanger, Puckett, Blevins
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- House requested conference committee
- House insisted on substitute
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 21-N)
- Passed House with substitute (75-Y 21-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1279H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104932D-H1
- Read third time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104932D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1279S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104570D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 2-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13104570D-S1
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 13101883D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (13)
April 3, 2013: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (31-Y 7-N)
April 3, 2013: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (34-Y 5-N)
April 3, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (74-Y 23-N)
February 23, 2013: Conference report agreed to by Senate (29-Y 11-N)
February 23, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N)
February 15, 2013: Senate acceded to request (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: House substitute rejected by Senate (3-Y 36-N)
February 8, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 21-N)
February 6, 2013: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
January 28, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor