+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 343 (effective 7/1/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0343)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1277ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106703D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106703D-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1277H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 19106703D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101545D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
February 15, 2019: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2019: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor