+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0708)
On March 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 708 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1275ER)
On February 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - com. sub. w/amds SB1275ES1
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 051695840-S1
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Watkins agreed to
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 051695840-ES1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 051695840-S1
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 051655840
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 22, 2005: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from A., C. & N. R. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor