+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 21101399D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1274E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 3-N)
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101399D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
January 25, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
January 21, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor