+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0430)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 430 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1274ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1274S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104553D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 17104553D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101436D
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor