+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0320)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 320 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1273ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1273S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19104821D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19104821D-S1
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101420D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2019: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor