+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 128 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1270ER)
- Enrolled
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100625D
+ − Votes (6)
February 10, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2017: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2017: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2017: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2017: Rereferred from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor