+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
On April 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB127ER)
On March 1, 2004 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 30, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2004 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB127S2
- Substitute by Sen. Watkins agreed to 048236840-S2
- Reading of substitute waived
- Floor substitute printed 048236840-S2 (Watkins)
- Committee substitute rejected 048223840-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 048223840-S1
On January 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/07/04 042305840
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Tra. (21-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2004: Reported from Transportation w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor