+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1269S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103534D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103534D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101311D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 29, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor