+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0772)
On March 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 772 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1267ER)
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (38-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1267H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 053696204-H1
- Read third time
On February 21, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053696204-H1
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with sub (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: Subcommittee #3...
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 055453772