+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 677 (effective 7/1/23)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0677)
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1264ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 23103728D-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1264E
- Amendment by Senator McDougle agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Judiciary with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103728D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (8)
February 23, 2023: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (20-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2023: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2023: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor