+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On February 16, 2005 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
- Assigned to App. sub-committee: Higher Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 050213788-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1262S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 050213788-S1
On January 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 059241788
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2005: Tabled in Appropriations (24-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2005: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor