+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0622)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 622 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1262ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 098257338-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1262E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098257338
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor