+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 350 (effective 7/1/21)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1259ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 5-N)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1259S1
- Amendment by Senator Marsden rejected
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103749D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103749D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101430D