+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0178)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 178 (effective 7/1/11)
On March 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1256ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: #2
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103107D
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2011: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor