+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- No action taken by Education and Health
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- VOTE: REFER TO COMMITTEE (23-Y 16-N)
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to (23-Y 16-N)
- VOTE: SPECIFIC & SEVERABLE (6-Y 33-N)
- (6-Y 33-N)
- Motion Governor's substitute is not specific & severable
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- Governor's substitute printed 038121211-S1
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On February 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1255ER)
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 11, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read second time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Printed as engrossed 032021408-E
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Presented & ordered printed 032021408
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: SPECIFIC & SEVERABLE (6-Y 33-N)
April 2, 2003: VOTE: REFER TO COMMITTEE (23-Y 16-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2003: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2003: Reported from Rules with amendments (16-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor