+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in General Laws by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1254S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103733D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
- Committee substitute printed 21103733D-S1
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100962D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
January 28, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (10-Y 4-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor