+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0093)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 93 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 14, 2019
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1247ER)
- Enrolled
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1247S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105336D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105336D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
On January 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101786D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 11, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2019: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
January 24, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2019: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor