+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
On February 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103760D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1246S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21103760D-S1
- Incorporates SB1376 (Saslaw)
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100746D