+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 732 (effective 7/1/07)
On March 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1241ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute with amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 072588776-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
- Amendment by Delegate Byron agreed to
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment SB1241H1
- Passed House with substitute with amendment (88-Y 11-N)
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
- Committee substitute printed 072588776-H1
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1241E
- Printed as engrossed 072519776-E
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced bill reprinted 072519776
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072519776
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2007: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N)
February 14, 2007: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
January 25, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor