+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
On March 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1240ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1240H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077663800- H1
- Read third time
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 077663800-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 072468129
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2007: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor