+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0564)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 564 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1238ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: 1
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 1-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 093544828
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2009: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
January 27, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
January 23, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2009: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor