+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0923)
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB1237ER2)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 4, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Enacted, Chapter 923 (effective 7/1/07)
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation received by Senate
On March 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1237ER)
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Committee substitute agreed to 077863782-H1
- Read third time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1237H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute printed 077863782-H1
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1237S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 070574782-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 070574782-S1
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078941782
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 4, 2007: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
April 4, 2007: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2007: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor