+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
On March 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 718 (effective 7/1/05)
On March 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1237ER)
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House with amendments (95-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
On February 11, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 056713102-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1237E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read second time
On February 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 056713102