+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 11-N)
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105048D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1236S1
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 4-N 2-A)
- Committee substitute printed 19105048D-S1
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101538D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2019: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (11-Y 11-N)
February 11, 2019: Failed to report (defeated) in Education (10-Y 11-N)
February 6, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
January 22, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N)
January 18, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2019: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 4-N 2-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor