+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (94)
On April 6, 1999 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0643)
On March 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 643 (effective-see bill)
On March 18, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1235ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- Amendments by Mr. Brink agreed to (49-Y 48-N)
- Amendment #1 by Mr. Joannou rejected (46-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (44-Y 53-N 1-A)
- Amendment by Mr. McEachin rejected (44-Y 53-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Amendments #5-10 by Mr. Davies agreed to
- VOTE: ADOPTION (49-Y 48-N 1-A)
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments by Mr. Williams rejected
- VOTE: ADOPTION (46-Y 50-N)
- Amendments by Mr. Tate rejected (40-Y 55-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Amendments #1-4 by Mr. Davies agreed to
- Amendments by Mr. Rust agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 994836759-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: ADOPTION (40-Y 55-N 1-A)
- Motion to recon. Mr. Joannou amd #1 agreed to (51-Y 47-N)
- Motion to reconsider Mr. Brink amds agreed to (50-Y 48-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (50-Y 48-N)
- Title replaced
On February 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUB. W/AMDS. (40-Y 0-N)
- House sub. w/amds. agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Pending question ordered
- VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (29-Y 11-N)
- Motion for pending question agreed to (29-Y 11-N)
- Reading of substitute with amendments waived
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed House with sub. with amendments (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub./w amds 994836759-EH1
- VOTE: ADOPTION (49-Y 49-N 1-A)
- Amendment by Mr. Joanou rejected (49-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (49-Y 50-N 1-A)
- Amendment #1 by Mr. Joannou rejected (49-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (48-Y 50-N 1-A)
- Amendments by Mr. Brink rejected (48-Y 50-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (51-Y 47-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 994836759-H1
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Read first time
On February 16, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 990488760-ES3
On February 9, 1999 in the Senate:
- Chair rules Sen. Woods substitute is germane (21-Y 19-N)
- Amendments by Sen. Puckett agreed to (36-Y 3-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Floor substitute printed 990488760-S3 (Woods)
- Substitute by Sen. Woods agreed to 990488760-S3
- VOTE: SUSTAIN RULING CHAIR (21-Y 19-N)
- Substitute by Sen. Walker withdrawn 993404753-S4 (Walker)
- Floor substitute printed 993404753-S4 (Walker)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee on C. & L. substitute rejected 993397759-S2
- Committee on Ed. & H. substitute rejected 993381759-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Amendments by Sen. Puckett reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1-7 (36-Y 3-N)
- Amendments by Sen. Puckett agreed to (37-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. w/amds. 990488760-ES3
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (16-Y 19-N)
- Motion to susp. Rules to add co-patrons rej. (16-Y 19-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1-7 (37-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (20-Y 19-N)
- Amendment by Sen. Bolling agreed to (20-Y 19-N)
- Reading of amendment waived
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3 (18-Y 21-N)
- Amendments by Sen. Edwards rejected (18-Y 21-N)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Couric agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
On February 8, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 993397759-S2
On February 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Commerce and Labor
- Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 993381759-S1
On January 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Professions
On January 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 992865759
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (25)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: PENDING QUESTION (29-Y 11-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (40-Y 55-N 1-A)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (49-Y 48-N 1-A)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (44-Y 53-N 1-A)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (46-Y 50-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (50-Y 48-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDERATION (51-Y 47-N)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (48-Y 50-N 1-A)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (49-Y 50-N 1-A)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (49-Y 49-N 1-A)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE SUB. W/AMDS. (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: SUSTAIN RULING CHAIR (21-Y 19-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1-7 (36-Y 3-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1-7 (37-Y 3-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1,2,3 (18-Y 21-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND 1 (20-Y 19-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 1999: VOTE: SUSPEND THE RULES (16-Y 19-N)
February 8, 1999: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1999: Reported from Ed. & H. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor