+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 476 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0476)
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1235ER)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time
- Passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104201D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1235S1
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 13104201D-S1
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100475D
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 12, 2013: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2013: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor