+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Tabled in Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 23106852D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 23105211D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1234S1
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 23105211D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104020D