+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Tabled in Transportation (12-Y 10-N)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101505D
+ − Votes (5)
February 17, 2011: Tabled in Transportation (12-Y 10-N)
February 16, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 2-N)
February 2, 2011: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor