+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0712)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 712 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023
On March 8, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1233ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference substitute printed 23107585D-S1
- Amended by conference committee
On February 25, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 23106792D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1233H1
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- House insisted on substitute
- House requested conference committee
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Obenshain, Surovell, Boysko
On February 23, 2023 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Wilt, Bell, Delaney
On February 22, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2023 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 23106792D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2023 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On February 7, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102671D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 25, 2023: VOTE: Adoption (93-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2023: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2023: House substitute rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N)
February 23, 2023: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2023: Senate acceded to request (37-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2023: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2023: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2023: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 13, 2023: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor