+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Left in Privileges and Elections
On February 17, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Printed as engrossed 095590201-E
- Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1230E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read second time
On February 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 095590201
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2009: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely
February 9, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
February 5, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (8-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor