+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0289)
On March 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 289 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1229ER)
On February 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (91-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 039411568-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 039411568-H1
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 039411568-H1
- Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 039367568-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 039367568-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 039367568-S1
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation w/sub (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 031314568
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2003: VOTE: CONCUR HOUSE AMENDMENT (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: Reported from Tra. w/sub (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: Reported from Transportation w/sub (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor