+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 350 (effective 7/1/15)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0350)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1226ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N)
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1226S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104912D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 15104912D-S1
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101719D
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2015: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 1-N)
February 12, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor