+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0920)
On March 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 920 (effective 7/1/03)
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1225ER)
On February 10, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 7, 2003 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 6, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
On January 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 034100568
+ − Votes (5)
February 10, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2003: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor