+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0527)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 527 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1225ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On February 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: 1
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 098657326
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
February 2, 2009: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2009: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor