+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Education by voice vote
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On January 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101489D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (4)
February 2, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 29, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (35-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2021: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2021: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor