+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 326 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1223ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N)
- Passed House (57-Y 42-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N)
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101437D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2021: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N)
February 16, 2021: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N)
February 15, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
January 29, 2021: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 15-N)
January 27, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor